U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pettit
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 13, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 08, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • September 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 11, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 24, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.