U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arguello-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Request]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.