U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shangreaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 26, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 16, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.