U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Westby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 02, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • November 02, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 26, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 22, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver]
  • August 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Request]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.