U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Metcalf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Response]
  • January 12, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 28, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2020: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • December 17, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • December 17, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response]
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 24, 2020: [Suppress]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2020: [Consent]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2020: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2019: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Request]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2019: [Request]
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.