U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grey Owl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 07, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 17, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 27, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 24, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 05, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.