U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 05, 2019: [Request]
  • September 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 29, 2019: [Request]
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.