U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-04004
  • Case Name: Pulse v. Agan Drywall Supply, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Request for Certified Copy]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Request for Certified Copy]
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.