U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-10017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weasel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 23, 2020: [Response]
  • December 23, 2020: [Furlough]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 04, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.