U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whiteman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Request]
  • September 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.