U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kindle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 03, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Request]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.