U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sitzmann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 02, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2020: [Consent]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response]
  • September 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Request]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • September 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 05, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.