U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Groethe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Request]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.