U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 16, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 15, 2020: [Furlough]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 07, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2019: [Request]
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.