U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gorisek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 31, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Request]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.