U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harvey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 05, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Request]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 13, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 11, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.