U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Baten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2019: [Request]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.