U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 04, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 23, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 08, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • November 05, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Request]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.