U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bennett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 14, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extend]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extend]
  • March 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 30, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 30, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 30, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 11, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 11, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Request]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 09, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.