U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nowell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 19, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Request]
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.