U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barillas-Munguia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 21, 2020: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Request]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.