U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montileaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Request]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 27, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.