U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hultgren Construction, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 26, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 06, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.