U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Hoop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 20, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 12, 2021: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 30, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2021: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • November 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Response]
  • November 09, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 09, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2020: [Suppress]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Brief]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Request]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.