U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 25, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 12, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2019: [Waiver]
  • October 02, 2019: [Request]
  • October 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 01, 2019: [Request]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [Arrest]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.