U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2023: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 10, 2023: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 13, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
  • November 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Request]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.