U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Lance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 16, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 06, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Request]
  • January 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Request]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.