open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01019
    Party Name:Nieuwsma v. United States Government et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Motion Response]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67130
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =