open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:19-cv-05064
    Party Name:Duszak v. Younie et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Notice under Rule 4(m)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons(es)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67129
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =