U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LeClaire
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 12, 2020: [Furlough]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 29, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 28, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 21, 2020: [Request]
  • April 21, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • April 08, 2020: [Request]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2020: [Request]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Request]
  • February 27, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 17, 2019: [Request]
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Request]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.