U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2019: [Request]
  • September 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Request]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.