U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 31, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request]
  • November 14, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 14, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Request]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.