U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 14, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2019: [Request]
  • September 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.