open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04158
    Party Name:Whitehurst et al v. The Kingdom Trust Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:February 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena Returned]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Report]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Discovery Report]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67136
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =