U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Robe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2023: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2023: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Extend]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 22, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • September 22, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 22, 2022: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Verdict]
  • September 22, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 22, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • September 22, 2022: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 21, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • September 21, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 19, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 19, 2022: [Jury List]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 12, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 02, 2022: [Objection]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 20, 2021: [Response]
  • September 13, 2021: [Supplement]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • July 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Delivered]
  • June 30, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 29, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Supplement]
  • June 24, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 21, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 21, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 21, 2021: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 15, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 02, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 01, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2021: [Request]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 15, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 15, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • March 05, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 05, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 02, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 25, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Request]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.