U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bobtail Bear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 26, 2020: [Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Request]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.