U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30028
  • Case Name: Byron David Caauwe and Jill Renee Caauwe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Closing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.