U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-04007
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Jandreau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 27, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • November 07, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.