U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40470
  • Case Name: Tara Rose Nelson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.