U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10086
  • Case Name: Gregory Joseph Pesall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
July, 2020
  • July 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service pursuant to Bankr. D.S.D. R. 9072-1(b) of the proposed order]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service pursuant to Bankr. D.S.D. R. 9072-1(b) of the proposed order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.