U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godinez-Meza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Response]
  • November 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.