U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gudiel-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.