U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena-Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 31, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • October 08, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.