U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Donis-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 25, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 12, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 04, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Response]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 09, 2019: [Request]
  • October 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.