U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • January 26, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 25, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 08, 2021: [Forfeiture]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • October 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Request]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • October 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.