U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 26, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • November 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 12, 2019: [Furlough]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Request]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.