U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • June 09, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Evaluation]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 11, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.