U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Decoteau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2020: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 01, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Request]
  • October 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2019: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.