U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-40098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tuttle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
  • April 30, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 02, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 18, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 14, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 29, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 24, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.