U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crawford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 03, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 03, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 27, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Request]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.